Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Capuzzi

Bishop Emeritus of Lodi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1929 BornManerbio
29 Jun 195222.9Ordained PriestPriest
7 Mar 198959.6AppointedBishop of Lodi, Italy
30 Apr 198959.7Ordained BishopBishop of Lodi, Italy
14 Nov 200576.3RetiredBishop of Lodi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Capuzzi:
Bishop Giacomo Capuzzi (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Lodi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lodi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Nov 2005
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116, Number 10,345

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013