Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Verzeletti

Bishop of Castanhal, Para


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1950 BornTrenzano, Italy
12 Jun 197625.7Ordained PriestPriest
15 May 199645.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
15 May 199645.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Tepelta
28 Jul 199645.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tepelta
29 Dec 200454.3AppointedBishop of Castanhal, Para, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Carlos Verzeletti:
Bishop Carlos Verzeletti (born ) Bishop of Castanhal

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Castanhal.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,839
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015