Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri-Marie-Ernest-Désiré Pinault, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chengdu [Chengtu], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1904Born
192217.3ProfessedMember of La Société des Missions Etrangères
22 Dec 192824.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of La Société des Missions Etrangères
29 Jun 192924.8Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
14 Jul 194944.8AppointedBishop of Chengdu [Chengtu], China
21 Sep 194945.0Ordained BishopBishop of Chengdu [Chengtu], China
1983²78.3RetiredBishop of Chengdu [Chengtu], China
24 Feb 198782.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Chengdu [Chengtu], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Henri-Marie-Ernest-Désiré Pinault
Bishop Henri-Marie-Ernest-Désiré Pinault M.E.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chengdu [Chengtu]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrévérien, Archdiocese of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France
Ordained DeaconForeign Missions, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained PriestForeign Missions, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopChengtu, Diocese of Chengdu [Chengtu]
Death PlaceÉvran, Diocese of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier), France

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 37.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 80
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 11 Jul 2018

Quantcast