Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Bunluen Mansap

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ubon Ratchathani


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1929BornWatpleng
21 Dec 195122.7Ordained PriestPriest
21 May 197647.1AppointedBishop of Ubon Ratchathani, Thailand
12 Aug 197647.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ubon Ratchathani, Thailand
25 Mar 200677.0RetiredBishop of Ubon Ratchathani, Thailand
2 Dec 201081.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Ubon Ratchathani, Thailand

MicroData Summary for Michael Bunluen Mansap:
Bishop Michael Bunluen Mansap (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ubon Ratchathani

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a bishop for 34.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Mar 2006
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013