Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Enrique Eguía Seguí

Auxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires

Titular Bishop of Cissi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1962 BornBuenos Aires
3 Dec 198826.0Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
4 Sep 200845.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
4 Sep 200845.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Cissi
11 Oct 200845.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cissi

MicroData Summary for Enrique Eguía Seguí:
Bishop Enrique Eguía Seguí (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Buenos Aires.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Sep 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Number 15,980

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013