Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eduardo Maria Taussig

Bishop Emeritus of San Rafael, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1954 Born
3 Dec 198228.4Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
21 Jul 200450.0AppointedBishop of San Rafael, Argentina
25 Sep 200450.2Ordained BishopBishop of San Rafael, Argentina
11 Oct 200450.2InstalledBishop of San Rafael, Argentina
5 Feb 202267.5ResignedBishop of San Rafael, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Eduardo Maria Taussig
(VIAF: 88878179; WikiData: Q1291070)
Bishop Eduardo Maria Taussig (born ) Bishop Emeritus of San Rafael

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora de Luján, Basilica, Luján

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Rafael.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,694
  • r: Bollettino, 5 Feb 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 25 Feb 2023