Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Rubén Lugones, S.J.

Bishop of Lomas de Zamora, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1952 Born
22 Apr 197926.7ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
3 Dec 198836.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
2 Jun 199946.8AppointedBishop of Orán, Argentina
30 Jul 199946.9Ordained BishopBishop of Orán, Argentina
6 Aug 199947.0InstalledBishop of Orán, Argentina
14 Oct 200856.2AppointedBishop of Lomas de Zamora, Argentina
22 Nov 200856.3InstalledBishop of Lomas de Zamora, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Jorge Rubén Lugones
Bishop Jorge Rubén Lugones S.J. (born ) Bishop of Lomas de Zamora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVeinticinco de Mayo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lomas de Zamora.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Oct 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Number 13,591

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 Jun 2017