Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Paraná

Archidioecesis Paranensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 20 April 1934
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Argentina
  • Square Kilometers: 30,348 (11,721 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Monte Caseros 77, 3100 Parana [Entre Rios], Argentina
  • Telephone: (0343) 4311.440; 422.06.84
  • Fax: 4230.372

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Paraná
13 June 1859ErectedDiocese of Buenos Aires Diocese of Paraná (erected)
15 February 1897Territory LostDiocese of Paraná Diocese of Santa Fe (erected)
21 January 1910Territory LostDiocese of Paraná Diocese of Corrientes (erected)
Archdiocese of Paraná
20 April 1934ElevatedDiocese of Paraná Archdiocese of Paraná
11 February 1957Territory LostArchdiocese of Paraná Diocese of Gualeguaychú (erected)
10 April 1961Territory LostArchdiocese of Paraná Diocese of Concordia (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Paraná
1950720,000826,41487.1%105721774,06711947755ap1951
1965367,000407,45890.1%6026864,2674133132ap1967
1970432,000480,00090.0%6330934,6454329037ap1971
1976350,000377,77592.6%5827854,1173722539ap1977
1980354,000382,00092.7%5420744,7832620140ap1981
1990426,000464,13791.8%5916755,6802419245ap1991
1999426,150502,50084.8%93171103,8742916847ap2000
2000426,150502,50084.8%102171193,5812716249ap2001
2001452,250502,50090.0%107151223,7062917345ap2002
2002452,250502,50090.0%109151243,6472817345ap2003
2003452,250502,50090.0%103251283,5333318046ap2004
2004452,250502,50090.0%104131173,8652118849ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 30 Jun 2013