Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquín Mariano Sucunza

Auxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina

Titular Bishop of Saetabis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1946 Born
27 Nov 197125.7Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
22 Jul 200054.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
22 Jul 200054.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Saetabis
21 Oct 200054.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Saetabis

MicroData Summary for Joaquín Mariano Sucunza
Bishop Joaquín Mariano Sucunza (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires

EventPlace
Birth PlacePamplona, Spain

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Buenos Aires.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 161, Number 13,855

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 29 Nov 2017