Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adolfo Armando Uriona, F.D.P.

Bishop of Villa de la Concepción del Río Cuarto, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1955 Born
8 Mar 197923.7ProfessedMember of Sons of Divine Providence
28 Jun 198025.0Ordained PriestPriest of Sons of Divine Providence
4 Mar 200448.7AppointedBishop of Añatuya, Argentina
8 May 200448.9Ordained BishopBishop of Añatuya, Argentina
4 Nov 201459.4AppointedBishop of Villa de la Concepción del Río Cuarto, Argentina
19 Dec 201459.5InstalledBishop of Villa de la Concepción del Río Cuarto, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Adolfo Armando Uriona
Bishop Adolfo Armando Uriona F.D.P. (born ) Bishop of Villa de la Concepción del Río Cuarto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMar del Plata

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Villa de la Concepción del Río Cuarto.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,589
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Nov 2014
  • i: CB, 11 Nov 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018