Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Guido Marini

Bishop-Elect of Tortona, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1965 Born
4 Feb 198924.0Ordained PriestPriest of Genova-Bobbio, Italy
1 Oct 200742.6AppointedMaster of Pontifical Liturgical Celebrations of the Office of Liturgical Celebrations of the Supreme Pontiff
29 Aug 202156.5AppointedBishop of Tortona, Italy
17 Oct 202156.7Ordained BishopBishop of Tortona, Italy
7 Nov 202156.7InstalledBishop of Tortona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Guido Marini (VIAF: 160978751)
Father Guido Marini (born ) Bishop-Elect of Tortona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova, Archdiocese of Genova
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Tortona.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Oct 2007
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Aug 2021
  • ob: CB, 11 Sep 2021
  • c2/i: CB, 12 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Sep 2021

Quantcast