Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ariel Edgardo Torrado Mosconi

Coadjutor Bishop of Nueve de Julio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1961 BornVeinticinco de Mayo
17 Nov 199029.8Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
22 Nov 200847.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago del Estero, Argentina
22 Nov 200847.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Vicus Pacati
13 Dec 200847.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vicus Pacati
12 May 201554.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Nueve de Julio, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Ariel Edgardo Torrado Mosconi:
Bishop Ariel Edgardo Torrado Mosconi (born ) Coadjutor Bishop of Nueve de Julio

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nueve de Julio.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Nov 2008
  • ob/c1+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Number 15,998
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 May 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 12 May 2015