Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Mario Aurelio Cardinal Poli

Archbishop of Buenos Aires

Cardinal-Priest of San Roberto Bellarmino

Bishop of Argentina, Faithful of the Eastern Rites


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1947 BornBuenos Aires
25 Nov 197831.0Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
8 Feb 200254.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
8 Feb 200254.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Abidda
20 Apr 200254.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abidda
24 Jun 200860.6AppointedBishop of Santa Rosa, Argentina
28 Mar 201365.3AppointedArchbishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
20 Apr 201365.4InstalledArchbishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
4 May 201365.4AppointedBishop of Argentina, Faithful of the Eastern Rites
22 Feb 201466.2Elevated to Cardinal
22 Feb 201466.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Roberto Bellarmino
23 Feb 201466.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Roberto Bellarmino

MicroData Summary for Mario Aurelio Poli:
Mario Aurelio Cardinal Poli (born ) Archbishop of Buenos Aires

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Buenos Aires.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Jun 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,177
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Mar 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 May 2013
  • c: Bollettino, 12 Jan 2014
  • cp: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2014
  • i: CB, 24 Feb 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 10 Apr 2014