Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Carlos Alberto Novoa de Agustini, O.F.M. Cap.

Former Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Lomas de Zamora

Priest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1966 BornLomas de Zamora
1 Feb 198619.3ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
2 Mar 199124.4Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
18 May 199629.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
3 Dec 201347.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lomas de Zamora, Argentina
3 Dec 201347.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Masclianae
13 Dec 201347.2ResignedAuxiliary Bishop-Elect of Lomas de Zamora, Argentina
13 Dec 201347.2ResignedBishop-Elect of Masclianae

MicroData Summary for Carlos Alberto Novoa de Agustini:
Priest Carlos Alberto Novoa de Agustini O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Former Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Lomas de Zamora

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Lomas de Zamora.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Dec 2013
  • ob: CB, 7 Dec 2013
  • r: CB, 13 Dec 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 14 Dec 2013