Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Cardinal Vico

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1847Born
20 Sep 187326.6Ordained PriestPriest
24 Nov 189750.8AppointedApostolic Delegate to Colombia
22 Dec 189750.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Philippi
9 Jan 189851.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Philippi
28 Jan 190457.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Belgium
21 Oct 190760.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
27 Nov 191164.8Elevated to Cardinal
2 Dec 191265.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Callisto
11 Feb 191568.0AppointedPro-Prefect of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites
6 Dec 191568.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
8 Jul 191871.4AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites
25 Feb 192982.1DiedPrefect of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites

MicroData Summary for Antonio Vico (VIAF: 230367048)
Antonio Cardinal Vico (born , died ) Prefect of (Sacred) Rites

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAgugliano, Diocese of Ancona e Numana, Italy
Ordained PriestAncona, Diocese of Ancona e Numana, Italy
Ordained BishopCollegio Capranica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Santissimo Sacramento, Church, Agugliano, Archdiocese of Ancona e Numana, Italy

  • a priest for 55.4 years
  • a bishop for 31.1 years
  • a cardinal for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 453
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 2
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Jun 2017