Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jorge Eduardo Lozano

Coadjutor Archbishop of San Juan de Cuyo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1955 BornBuenos Aires
3 Dec 198227.8Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
4 Jan 200044.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
4 Jan 200044.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Furnos Maior
25 Mar 200045.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Furnos Maior
22 Dec 200550.8AppointedBishop of Gualeguaychú, Argentina
11 Mar 200651.0InstalledBishop of Gualeguaychú, Argentina
31 Aug 201661.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Jorge Eduardo Lozano
Archbishop Jorge Eduardo Lozano (born ) Coadjutor Archbishop of San Juan de Cuyo

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of San Juan de Cuyo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Dec 2005
  • i: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Number 13,725
  • ab: Bollettino, 31 Aug 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 31 Aug 2016