Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vicente Bokalic Iglic, C.M.

Bishop of Santiago del Estero


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1952 BornLanús
5 Jun 197624.0Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Congregation of the Mission
1 Apr 197825.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
15 Mar 201057.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
15 Mar 201057.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Summa
29 May 201058.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Summa
23 Dec 201361.5AppointedBishop of Santiago del Estero, Argentina
9 Mar 201461.7InstalledBishop of Santiago del Estero, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Vicente Bokalic Iglic:
Bishop Vicente Bokalic Iglic C.M. (born ) Bishop of Santiago del Estero

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Santiago del Estero.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Mar 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,648
  • ab: Bollettino, 23 Dec 2013
  • i: CB, 27 Dec 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 28 Dec 2013