Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfredo Horacio Zecca

Titular Archbishop of Volsinium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1949 Born
19 Nov 197627.1Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
10 Jun 201161.7AppointedArchbishop of Tucumán, Argentina
18 Aug 201161.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tucumán, Argentina
17 Sep 201161.9InstalledArchbishop of Tucumán, Argentina
9 Jun 201767.7ResignedArchbishop of Tucumán, Argentina
9 Jun 201767.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Volsinium

MicroData Summary for Alfredo Horacio Zecca (VIAF: 42539900)
Archbishop Alfredo Horacio Zecca (born ) Titular Archbishop of Volsinium

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires

Please contact the Archbishop through the Titular See of Volsinium.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Jun 2011
  • ob/i: CB, 14 Jun 2011
  • c3+: CB, 6 Jul 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,129
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jun 2017