Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anunciado Serafini

Deceased

Bishop of Mercedes, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1898Born
20 Dec 192426.0Ordained PriestPriest
11 May 193536.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of La Plata, Argentina
11 May 193536.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Arycanda
25 Jul 193536.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arycanda
18 Mar 193940.3AppointedBishop of Mercedes, Argentina
29 Jun 193940.6InstalledBishop of Mercedes, Argentina
18 Feb 196364.2DiedBishop of Mercedes, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Anunciado Serafini
Bishop Anunciado Serafini (born , died ) Bishop of Mercedes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTres Arroyos

  • a priest for 38.1 years
  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1935, Number 55
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 381, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast