Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paolo Rudelli

Apostolic Nuncio to Zimbabwe

Titular Archbishop of Mesembria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1970 Born
10 Jun 199524.9Ordained PriestPriest of Bergamo, Italy
20 Sep 201444.1AppointedPermanent Observer to Council of Europe
3 Sep 201949.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Mesembria
3 Sep 201949.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Other
4 Oct 201949.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Mesembria
25 Jan 202049.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Zimbabwe

MicroData Summary for Paolo Rudelli
Archbishop Paolo Rudelli (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Zimbabwe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGazzaniga, Diocese of Bergamo, Italy
Ordained PriestBergamo, Diocese of Bergamo, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Zimbabwe.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Sep 2014
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Sep 2019
  • ob/c2: CB, 3 Sep 2019
  • c34: CB, 4 Oct 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Number 20,252
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast