Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Padova {Padua}

Dioecesis Patavina



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Claudio Cipolla, Bishop
  • Antonio Mattiazzo, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 3rd Century
  • Metropolitan: Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Italy
  • Square Kilometers: 3,297 (1,273 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Triveneto
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesipadova.it/
  • Mailing Address: Via Dietro Duomo 15, 35139 Padova, Italia
  • Telephone: 049.822.61.11
  • Fax: 049.822.61.50

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
3rd CenturyErectedDiocese of Padova {Padua} (erected)
742Territory LostDiocese of Padova {Padua} Diocese of Malamocco (erected)
6 July 1751Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Padova {Padua} (from Aquileia to Udine)
28 January 1927Territory LostDiocese of Padova {Padua} (Malo) Diocese of Vicenza
18 March 1927Territory LostDiocese of Padova {Padua} (Right bank of the river Brenta near Piazzala sul Brenta) Diocese of Vicenza
23 March 1928Territory LostDiocese of Padova {Padua} (Casetta, Motta, Moresolo, Zennare (in the lower part), and S. Dominici) Diocese of Chioggia
14 September 1929Territory LostDiocese of Padova {Padua} (Battutilo, Cazzago, and Ball˛) Diocese of Treviso
20 August 1930Territory AddedDiocese of Vicenza (Bubbio, Burcia, and the area between BosÓ and Cittadella) Diocese of Padova {Padua}
20 August 1930Territory LostDiocese of Padova {Padua} (Saline, Vicentina, and Brancaglia) Diocese of Vicenza
21 November 1953Territory AddedDiocese of Adria (Frazione Padovana) Diocese of Padova {Padua}

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1886505,418.0%8330325OTC
1950837,015839,02499.8%9132941,2076936703,065401ap1951
1970860,000860,051100.0%9024421,3446396024,334432ap1971
1980956,000965,04099.1%9173991,3167266483,427453ap1981
1990982,777986,38799.6%8433791,222804106012,845459ap1991
19991,014,0301,019,57899.5%8343561,190852155962,467459ap2000
20001,008,9671,018,35499.1%8343331,167864185582,455459ap2001
20011,012,1281,021,64899.1%8193041,123901185162,518459ap2002
20021,027,8741,036,54799.2%8114381,249822194922,428459ap2003
20031,022,4511,034,22398.9%8053191,124909194822,332459ap2004
20041,027,6621,039,11798.9%7823291,111924254792,256459ap2005
20131,008,1121,076,95493.6%7242941,018990503951,722459ap2014
20161,029,0001,075,69895.7%6852739581,074533301,713459ap2017
20191,012,1571,059,43795.5%6662709361,081544161,433459ap2020
20211,000,2401,046,85595.5%6312709011,110534031,474459ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 385, and Page 386
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 210
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 267
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 275, and Page 276
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 308, and Page 309
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 330
  • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 797, to Page 799
  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 23, Page 332, and Page 333
  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 46, Page 414, and Page 415

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.7, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 25 Apr 2024