Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pietro Pileo Cardinal da Prata

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1330¹Born
1 Jun 135828.4AppointedBishop of Treviso, Italy
12 Jun 135929.4AppointedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
23 Jan 137040.0AppointedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
18 Sep 137848.7AppointedAdministrator of Ravenna, Italy
18 Sep 137848.7Elevated to Cardinal
18 Sep 137848.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
1385¹55.0ResignedAdministrator of Ravenna, Italy
10 Nov 138555.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
29 Jan 138757.0AppointedAdministrator of Viviers (Aps), France
13 Jun 138757.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
Sep 1390³60.6ResignedAdministrator of Viviers (Aps), France
1400¹70.0DiedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Pietro Pileo da Prata
Pietro Pileo Cardinal da Prata (born 1330, died 1400) Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

EventPlace
Birth PlaceConcordia Veneta, Friuli
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Padua, Diocese of Padova {Padua}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 21.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 480, and Page 386
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 415
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Sep 1378

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 May 2021

Quantcast