Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Paul II

Pietro Barbo

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1417Born
1 Jul 144023.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Nuova
1 Jul 144023.3Elevated to Cardinal
1 Jul 144023.3AppointedAdministrator of Cervia, Italy
16 Jun 145134.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
16 Jun 145134.3AppointedBishop of Vicenza, Italy
19 Jun 145134.3ResignedAdministrator of Cervia, Italy
9 Mar 145942.0AppointedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
26 Mar 146043.0ResignedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
30 Aug 146447.5ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
14 Sep 146447.5Ordained BishopPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
16 Sep 146447.5InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
26 Jul 147154.4DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Pietro Barbo (VIAF: 316406291)
Pope Pietro Barbo (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 6.8 years
  • a cardinal for 24.2 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Jul 1440
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1464, Number 8
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 267
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 639
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 85, Number 7,008

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast