Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Oscar Rizzato

Deceased

Almoner Emeritus of the Office of Papal Charities

Titular Archbishop of Virunum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1929Born
4 Jul 195425.4Ordained PriestPriest of Padova {Padua}, Italy
23 Dec 198960.8AppointedAlmoner of the Office of Papal Charities
23 Dec 198960.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Virunum
6 Jan 199060.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Virunum
28 Jul 200778.4RetiredAlmoner of the Office of Papal Charities
11 Jan 202191.9DiedAlmoner Emeritus of the Office of Papal Charities

MicroData Summary for Oscar Rizzato
Archbishop Oscar Rizzato (born , died ) Almoner Emeritus of Papal Charities

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Giorgio della Pertiche, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlacePadova, Diocese of Padova {Padua}, Italy

  • a priest for 66.5 years
  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Jul 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,680
  • d: CB, 13 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 13 Jan 2021

Quantcast