Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Monsignor Renzo Pegoraro

President of the Pontifical Academy for Life

Priest of Padova {Padua}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1959 Born
11 Jun 198930.0Ordained PriestPriest of Padova {Padua}, Italy
1 Sep 201152.2AppointedChancellor of the Pontifical Academy for Life
27 May 202565.9AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Academy for Life

MicroData Summary
Renzo Pegoraro
Monsignor Renzo Pegoraro
(born )
President of Life

EventPlace
Birth PlacePadova, Diocese of Padova {Padua}, Italy

Please contact the Monsignor through the Pontifical Academy for Life.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 May 2025

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 27 May 2025