Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Paganus della Torre

Deceased

Patriarch of Aquileia, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Apr 1302AppointedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
9 Apr 1302Ordained BishopBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
23 Mar 1319AppointedPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy
19 Dec 1331DiedPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paganus della Torre
Patriarch Paganus della Torre (died ) Patriarch of Aquileia

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 29.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 385, and Page 66
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 102, Number 8,790

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 22 Dec 2020

Quantcast