Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fantino Dandolo

Deceased

Bishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1380Born
4 Sep 144464.6AppointedArchbishop of Candia {Crete}, Greece
21 Feb 144565.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Candia {Crete}, Greece
8 Jan 144868.0AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Padova {Padua}, Italy
17 Feb 145979.1DiedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Fantino Dandolo
Archbishop Fantino Dandolo (born 1380, died ) Bishop of Padova {Padua}

  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,758
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,008
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 139, and Page 210

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast