Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pietro Cardinal Foscari

Deceased

Administrator of Padova {Padua}, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Nicola fra le Immagini


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1417¹Born
14 Nov 145538.8AppointedBishop of Treviso, Italy
10 Dec 147760.9Elevated to Cardinal
12 Dec 147760.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Nicola fra le Immagini
1 Apr 147861.2AppointedAdministrator of Split (Spalato), Croatia
17 Sep 147962.7ResignedAdministrator of Split (Spalato), Croatia
15 Apr 148164.2AppointedAdministrator of Padova {Padua}, Italy
11 Aug 148568.6DiedAdministrator of Padova {Padua}, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Pietro Foscari
Pietro Cardinal Foscari (born 1417, died ) Administrator of Padova {Padua}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}

  • a cardinal for 7.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Dec 1477
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 240, and Page 248
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1455

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast