Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Simone Cardinal Paltineri

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1200¹Born
17 Nov 125454.8AppointedAdministrator of Aversa, Italy
1259¹59.0ResignedAdministrator of Aversa, Italy
17 Dec 126161.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
17 Dec 126161.9Elevated to Cardinal
7 Feb 1277³77.0DiedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Simone Paltineri
Simone Cardinal Paltineri (born 1200, died )

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonselice, Diocese of Padova {Padua}, Italy
Death PlaceViterbo, Diocese of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Lorenzo, Cathedral, Viterbo, Diocese of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy

  • a cardinal for 15.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Dec 1261
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 122

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 17 Aug 2021

Quantcast