Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bartolomeo Cardinal Oleario, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1320¹Born
1381²61.0AppointedBishop of Ancona, Italy
9 Dec 138565.9AppointedBishop of Firenze, Italy
18 Dec 138969.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
18 Dec 138969.9Elevated to Cardinal
16 Apr 139676.2DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Oleario
Bartolomeo Cardinal Oleario O.F.M. (born 1320, died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana

EventPlace
Birth PlacePadova, Diocese of Padova {Padua}, Italy
Death PlaceGaeta, Diocese of Gaeta, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Franciscan, Church, Gaeta, Diocese of Gaeta, Italy

  • a cardinal for 6.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1389
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 250, and Page 88

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 31 Jul 2021

Quantcast