Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Mietto, C.S.I. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Napo, Ecuador

Titular Bishop of Muzuca in Byzacena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1934Born
7 Oct 195117.3EnteredMember of Congregation of Saint Joseph
8 Dec 195218.5First VowsMember of Congregation of Saint Joseph
30 Mar 196328.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Saint Joseph
Jul 1982³48.0AppointedSuperior General of Congregation of Saint Joseph
1 Jul 199460.0AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Napo, Ecuador
1 Jul 199460.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Muzuca in Byzacena
22 Oct 199460.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Muzuca in Byzacena
2 Aug 199662.1SucceededVicar Apostolic of Napo, Ecuador
11 Jun 201076.0RetiredVicar Apostolic of Napo, Ecuador
10 Feb 201277.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of San Miguel de Sucumbķos, Ecuador
21 Nov 201379.4CeasedApostolic Administrator of San Miguel de Sucumbķos, Ecuador
25 May 202085.9DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Napo, Ecuador

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Mietto
Bishop Paolo Mietto C.S.I. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Napo

EventPlace
Birth PlacePadova, Diocese of Padova {Padua}, Italy
Ordained PriestViterbo, Diocese of Viterbo, Italy
Ordained BishopSanta Maria Immacolata e San Giovanni Berchmans, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceQuito, Archdiocese of Quito
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Tena, Archdiocese of Cuenca

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 25.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Jun 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,449
  • ab/smds: Bollettino, 10 Feb 2012
  • d: CB, 26 May 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast