Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Lublin

Archidioecesis Lublinensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Stanisław Budzik, Archbishop
  • Adam Piotr Bab, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Artur Grzegorz Miziński, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Józef Wróbel, S.C.I., Auxiliary Bishop
  • Mieczysław Cisło, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 25 March 1992
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Poland
  • Square Kilometers: 9,108 (3,517 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: https://archidiecezjalubelska.pl
  • Mailing Address: Kuria Metropolitalna, ul. Prymasa Stefana Wyszynskiego 2, 20-105 Lublin, Polska
  • Telephone: (081)532.10.58

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Chełm
1375ErectedDiocese of Chełm (erected)
Diocese of Chełm and Lublin
1790Name ChangedDiocese of Chełm
Diocese of Kraków
Diocese of Chełm and Lublin
Diocese of Lublin
22 September 1805Name ChangedDiocese of Chełm and Lublin Diocese of Lublin
Diocese of Lublin and Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów)
30 December 1889UnitedDiocese of Lublin
Diocese of Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów)
Diocese of Lublin and Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów)
Diocese of Lublin
24 October 1918SplitDiocese of Lublin and Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów) Diocese of Lublin
Diocese of Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów)
30 October 1922Territory AddedDiocese of Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów) (Krasne) Diocese of Lublin
19 December 1936Territory LostDiocese of Lublin (Krame) Diocese of Siedlce
1 April 1939Territory LostDiocese of Lublin (Tilniki and Wladyslawów) Diocese of Siedlce
25 March 1992Territory LostDiocese of Lublin (Janów Lubelski and Zaklików)
Diocese of Przemyśl (Gorzyce Tarnobrzeskie, Nisko, Raniżów, Rudnik nad Sanem, Stalowa Wola, Tarnobrzeg Południe, and Tarnobrzeg Północ)
Diocese of Sandomierz-Radom (Koprzywnica, Łagów, Opatów, Ostrowiec Świętokrzyski-Wschód, Ostrowiec Świętokrzyski-Zachód, Sandomierz, Staszów, and Zawichost)
Diocese of Tarnów (Baranów)
Diocese of Sandomierz
25 March 1992Territory LostApostolic Administration of Lubaczów
Diocese of Lublin
Diocese of Zamość-Lubaczów (Biłgoraj, Cieszanów, Hrubieszów, Józefów, Lubaczów, Narol, Szczebrzeszyn, Tarnogród, Tarnoszyn, Tomaszów Lubelski, Tyszowce, Uchanie, Zamość-Kolegiata, and Zamość-Nowe Miasto.)
Archdiocese of Lublin
25 March 1992ElevatedDiocese of Lublin Archdiocese of Lublin

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Lublin
19491,115,0001,126,00099.0%415564712,36784628251ap1951
19701,411,5001,615,00087.4%6451237681,8371651,028253ap1971
19801,492,5201,739,36085.8%7211528731,709220923274ap1981
19901,554,0101,793,67886.6%9181801,0981,4153591,100403ap1991
Archdiocese of Lublin
19991,028,9771,064,55796.7%9872411,228837415742252ap2000
20001,032,0071,049,79798.3%1,0212511,272811422809253ap2001
20011,049,4351,070,01798.1%9362101,146915398752252ap2002
20021,039,4001,066,46797.5%1,0612051,266821405677254ap2003
20031,093,2151,124,41497.2%1,0602071,267862405684254ap2004
20041,070,0001,097,57097.5%1,1482221,370781402723256ap2005
20131,024,3941,132,98490.4%1,3352341,569652293614269ap2014
20161,054,3711,092,36196.5%8282151,0431,010277576271ap2017
20191,027,4211,079,14495.2%8321911,0231,004251534271ap2020
20211,049,8581,103,48695.1%8041829861,064232485271ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Chełm
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 184
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 126
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 164, and Page 165
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 147
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 156, and Page 157
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 162, and Page 163
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 344
  • Diocese of Chełm and Lublin
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 243
  • Diocese of Lublin
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 349
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 361
  • Diocese of Lublin
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 14, Page 642
  • Archdiocese of Lublin
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 84, Page 1,099, to Page 1,112
  • ============

    Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
    Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
    Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
    Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
    Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
    Eastern Catholic Churches

    ============

    About Catholic-Hierarchy
    Terminology/Site Help
    [ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
    Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 9 Apr 2024