Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Kaźmierski

Deceased

Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1420¹Born
6 Mar 148060.1AppointedBishop of Chełm, Poland
10 May 148464.3AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
18 Nov 1484³64.8DiedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Kaźmierski
Bishop Jan Kaźmierski (born 1420, died ) Bishop of Przemyśl

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 219, and Page 126
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1480, Number 9*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast