Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Piotr Hemperek

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lublin, Poland

Titular Bishop of Equilium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1931Born
17 Dec 195524.4Ordained PriestPriest of Lublin, Poland
7 May 198250.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lublin, Poland
7 May 198250.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Equilium
30 May 198250.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Equilium
4 Jul 199261.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lublin, Poland

MicroData Summary for Piotr Hemperek (VIAF: 40724685)
Bishop Piotr Hemperek (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lublin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIgnaców
Ordained BishopSts. John the Baptist and John the Evangelist, Cathedral, Lublin, Diocese of Lublin

  • a priest for 36.5 years
  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 75, Number 6,032

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast