Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mieczysław Cisło

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Lublin, Poland

Titular Bishop of Auca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1945 Born
14 Jun 197024.8Ordained PriestPriest of Lublin, Poland
13 Dec 199752.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lublin, Poland
13 Dec 199752.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Auca
2 Feb 199852.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Auca
15 Aug 202075.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Lublin, Poland

MicroData Summary for Mieczysław Cisło
Bishop Mieczysław Cisło (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Lublin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNiemirówek
Ordained BishopCathedral, Lublin, Archdiocese of Lublin

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Lublin.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,234
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 7 Jan 2021

Quantcast