Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Wladyslaw Goral

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lublin, Poland

Titular Bishop of Meloë in Isauria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1898Born
18 Dec 192022.6Ordained PriestPriest
10 Aug 193840.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lublin, Poland
10 Aug 193840.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Meloë in Isauria
9 Oct 193840.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Meloë in Isauria
Apr 1944³45.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lublin, Poland
13 Jun 1999Beatified

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bl. Wladyslaw Goral (VIAF: 101185250)
Bishop Bl. Wladyslaw Goral (born , died Apr 1944) Auxiliary Bishop of Lublin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStoczek

  • a priest for 23.2 years
  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1947
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1938, Number 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast