Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanisław Stefanek, S. Chr. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Łomża, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1936Born
28 Jun 195923.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Christ for Polish Immigrants
4 Jul 198044.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Szczecin-Kamień, Poland
4 Jul 198044.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Forum Popilii
24 Aug 198044.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Forum Popilii
26 Oct 199660.4AppointedBishop of Łomża, Poland
11 Nov 201175.5RetiredBishop of Łomża, Poland
17 Jan 202083.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Łomża, Poland

MicroData Summary for Stanisław Stefanek
Bishop Stanisław Stefanek S. Chr. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Łomża

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMajdan Sobieszczanski
Ordained BishopSt. Jacques, Szczecin, Diocese of Szczecin-Kamień
Death PlaceLublin, Archdiocese of Lublin

  • a priest for 60.5 years
  • a bishop for 39.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Nov 2011
  • d: CB, 17 Jan 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 68, Number 5,375

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast