Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Stanislaw Wojciech Wielgus

Titular Archbishop of Viminacium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1939 Born
10 Jun 196223.1Ordained PriestPriest of Lublin, Poland
24 May 199960.0AppointedBishop of Płock, Poland
1 Aug 199960.2Ordained BishopBishop of Płock, Poland
6 Dec 200667.6AppointedArchbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
5 Jan 200767.7InstalledArchbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
6 Jan 200767.7ResignedArchbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
6 Jan 200767.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Viminacium

MicroData Summary for Stanislaw Wojciech Wielgus
Archbishop Stanislaw Wojciech Wielgus (born ) Titular Archbishop of Viminacium

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWierzchowiska, Diocese of Sandomierz, Poland
Ordained BishopSaint Sigmund, Cathedral Basilica, Płock, Diocese of Płock, Poland

Please contact the Archbishop through the Titular See of Viminacium.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Dec 2006
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Jan 2007
  • i: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Number 13,592
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast