Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Dziaduski

Deceased

Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1496¹Born
1 Dec 154044.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
1 Dec 154044.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Margarita
31 May 154246.4AppointedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
30 Mar 154347.2AppointedBishop of Chełm, Poland
8 Jun 154549.4AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
28 Jul 155963.5DiedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Dziaduski (VIAF: 15146634294441930534)
Bishop Jan Dziaduski (born 1496, died ) Bishop of Przemyśl

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 164, and Page 148
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 279, and Page 235

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast