Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Samuel Maciejowski

Deceased

Bishop of Kraków, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1499³Born
1530¹30.9Ordained PriestPriest
17 Oct 153940.7AppointedBishop of Chełm, Poland
22 Aug 154142.6AppointedBishop of Płock, Poland
19 Jun 154647.4AppointedBishop of Kraków, Poland
26 Oct 155051.7DiedBishop of Kraków, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Samuel Maciejowski (VIAF: 35613049)
Bishop Samuel Maciejowski (born , died ) Bishop of Kraków

  • a priest for 20.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 180, and Page 276
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 164
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,539, Number 31*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast