Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Siedlce

Dioecesis Siedlecensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Kazimierz Gurda, Bishop
  • Grzegorz Suchodolski, Auxiliary Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 28 October 1925
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Lublin
  • Depends on: Dicastery for Bishops
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Poland
  • Square Kilometers: 11,440 (4,418 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: https://diecezja.siedlce.pl
  • Mailing Address: Kuria Diecezjalna, ul. Pilsudskiego 62, 08-110 Siedlce, Polska
  • Telephone: (025)644.21.95
  • Fax: 644.87.44

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów)
30 June 1818ErectedDiocese of Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów) (erected)
30 December 1889UnitedDiocese of Lublin
Diocese of Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów)
Diocese of Lublin and Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów)
Diocese of Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów)
24 October 1918SplitDiocese of Lublin and Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów) Diocese of Lublin
Diocese of Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów)
30 October 1922Territory LostDiocese of Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów) (Krasne) Diocese of Lublin
Diocese of Siedlce
28 October 1925Name ChangedDiocese of Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów) Diocese of Siedlce
20 December 1929Territory LostDiocese of Siedlce (Beguty and Tąbor) Archdiocese of Warszawa {Warsaw}
28 March 1930Territory AddedDiocese of Pinsk (Orchów) Diocese of Siedlce
14 March 1936Territory AddedDiocese of Łomża (Kościół) Diocese of Siedlce
19 December 1936Territory AddedDiocese of Lublin (Krame) Diocese of Siedlce
1 April 1939Territory AddedDiocese of Lublin (Tilniki and Wladyslawów) Diocese of Siedlce
25 March 1992Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Siedlce (from Warszawa)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Siedlce
1950738,268784,30094.1%328273552,07949306246ap1951
1970771,940.0%47339512077495242ap1971
1980816,482886,28292.1%447454921,65963486244ap1981
1990857,194881,23797.3%503475501,55865440265ap1991
1999726,947743,72197.7%540555951,22177347241ap2000
2000736,904757,15297.3%555526071,21474374242ap2001
2001742,809756,56298.2%565586231,19280383243ap2002
2002737,367751,55598.1%576566321,16679377243ap2003
2003739,699751,12798.5%582566381,15985355243ap2004
2004741,185752,69298.5%550616111,21375337242ap2005
2010724,675736,01498.5%592666581,10186300244ap2011
2014714,630726,10098.4%593676601,08287299245ap2015
2017707,100716,30098.7%594746681,05892297247ap2018
2020695,940705,25098.7%604776811,02193284249ap2021
2022693,204703,26898.6%602706721,03187273249ap2023

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów)
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 361
  • Diocese of Siedlce
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 17, Page 521, to Page 528
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 22, Page 392
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 28, Page 207
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 29, Page 213, and Page 214
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 31, Page 345
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 84, Page 1,099, to Page 1,112
  • ============

    Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
    Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
    Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
    Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
    Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
    Eastern Catholic Churches

    ============

    About Catholic-Hierarchy
    Terminology/Site Help
    [ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
    Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 9 Apr 2024