Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Władysław Suszyński

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Vilnius, Lithuania

Titular Bishop of Tabbora

Titular See: (Polish territory)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1898Born
26 May 192123.3Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jan 194849.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
19 Jan 194849.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Tabbora
9 May 194850.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tabbora
3 Jul 196870.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Vilnius, Lithuania
27 Oct 196870.7DiedApostolic Administrator of Vilnius, Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Władysław Suszyński
Bishop Władysław Suszyński (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Vilnius

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJanów

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1948, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast