Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciszek Jaczewski

Deceased

Bishop of Lublin and Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1832Born
12 Aug 185523.2Ordained PriestPriest
30 Dec 188957.6AppointedBishop of Lublin and Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów), Poland
18 May 189058.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lublin and Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów), Poland
23 Jul 191482.2DiedBishop of Lublin and Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów), Poland

MicroData Summary for Franciszek Jaczewski (VIAF: 11186288)
Bishop Franciszek Jaczewski (born , died ) Bishop of Lublin and Janów Podlaski (Podlaska o Janów)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGórki Grubaki
Ordained BishopSte Catherine, St. Petersbourg

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,587
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 349
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 29
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 53, Number 3,802

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast