Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Fermín Emilio Sosa Rodríguez

Apostolic Nuncio to Papua New Guinea

Titular Archbishop of Virunum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1968 Born
12 Jul 199830.2Ordained PriestPriest of Yucatán, México
31 Mar 202152.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Papua New Guinea
31 Mar 202152.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Virunum
19 Jun 202153.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Virunum

MicroData Summary for Fermín Emilio Sosa Rodríguez
Father Fermín Emilio Sosa Rodríguez (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Papua New Guinea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIzamal, Archdiocese of Yucatán, México, México
Ordained BishopSantuario Mariano de Nuestra Señora de la Inmaculada Concepción, Izamal, Archdiocese of Yucatán, México

Please contact the Father through the Nunciature to Papua New Guinea.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Mar 2021
  • ob/c2: CB, 15 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 16 Apr 2021

Quantcast