Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego de Landa, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Yucatán (Mérida)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1524BornCifuentes de Alcarria, Spain
17 Oct 157247.9AppointedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
1573²48.1Ordained BishopBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
29 Apr 157954.4DiedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego de Landa:
Bishop Diego de Landa O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Yucatán (Mérida)

  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 84, Number 507
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 338

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015