Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domingo (de Villaescusa) Ramírez de Arellano, O.S.H. †

Deceased

Bishop of Yucatán (Mérida)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1568²BornVillaescusa, Spain
19 Nov 164072.8AppointedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
24 Mar 164173.2Ordained BishopBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
2 Dec 165284.9AppointedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
2 Jul 165385.5DiedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domingo (de Villaescusa) Ramírez de Arellano:
Bishop Domingo (de Villaescusa) Ramírez de Arellano O.S.H. (died ) Bishop of Yucatán (Mérida)

  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 148, and Page 375
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 170, Number 1,061
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1641, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 17 Mar 2015