Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ferdinando Ruiz y Solózarno

Deceased

Archbishop of Yucatán, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1904Born
28 Mar 192823.4Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jan 194439.2AppointedArchbishop of Yucatán, México
16 Apr 194439.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Yucatán, México
15 May 196964.5DiedArchbishop of Yucatán, México

MicroData Summary for Ferdinando Ruiz y Solózarno
Archbishop Ferdinando Ruiz y Solózarno (born , died ) Archbishop of Yucatán

EventPlace
Birth PlacePátzcuaro

  • a priest for 41.1 years
  • a bishop for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,944, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast