Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lázaro Pérez Jiménez

Deceased

Bishop of Celaya, Guanajuato


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1943BornTizimín
21 Sep 196825.0Ordained PriestPriest of Yucatán, México
15 May 199147.7AppointedBishop of Autlán, Jalisco, México
29 Jun 199147.8Ordained BishopBishop of Autlán, Jalisco, México
26 Jul 200359.9AppointedBishop of Celaya, Guanajuato, México
25 Oct 200966.1DiedBishop of Celaya, Guanajuato, México

MicroData Summary for Lázaro Pérez Jiménez:
Bishop Lázaro Pérez Jiménez (born , died ) Bishop of Celaya

  • a priest for 41.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,603
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013