Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Manuel Garcia de Vargas y Ribera, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1706BornLima, Peru
20 Nov 176963.8AppointedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
30 Sep 177064.7Ordained BishopBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
14 Dec 177468.9DiedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
3 Apr 177569.2AppointedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Juan Manuel Garcia de Vargas y Ribera:
Bishop Juan Manuel Garcia de Vargas y Ribera O. de M. (born , died ) Bishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas)

  • a bishop for 4.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1770, Number 38
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 163, and Page 448

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015