Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Reyes de los Ríos de Lamadrid, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Yucatán (Mérida)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1657BornSevilla, Spain
11 Apr 169941.6AppointedBishop of Comayagua, Honduras
28 Jun 169941.9Ordained BishopBishop of Comayagua, Honduras
30 Mar 170042.6AppointedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
13 Oct 170043.1InstalledBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
6 Jan 171456.4DiedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México

MicroData Summary for Pedro Reyes de los Ríos de Lamadrid:
Bishop Pedro Reyes de los Ríos de Lamadrid O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Yucatán (Mérida)

  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 241, Number 1,491
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1699, Number 14
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 165, and Page 421

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 22 Jun 2015